NY S08259 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of opioid antagonists by persons or entities for opioid overdose prevention; defines "entity".
Title
Authorizes the use of opioid antagonists by persons or entities for opioid overdose prevention; defines "entity".
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.148 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.853 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8259 |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-03-02 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-27 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.429 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | reported |
2020-02-04 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-28 | Senate | print number 7812a |
2020-01-28 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-23 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7812A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.853 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2020-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A07812 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.148