NY S08262 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8262B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8262B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to continue to make payments of benefits, compensation and emoluments pursuant to the terms of any contract for transportation of school children that were in effect as of the date of any school closure which is due to a declared emergency as if the services had been provided.
Title
Requires school districts to continue to make payments of benefits, compensation and emoluments pursuant to the terms of any contract for transportation of school children that were in effect as of the date of any school closure which is due to a declared emergency as if the services had been provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8262B |
2020-08-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-08-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8262A |
2020-08-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10458 (Same As) 2020-09-09 - print number 10458a