NY S08269 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.349
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.349
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to dog licensing in the village of St. Johnsville.
Title
Relates to dog licensing in the village of St. Johnsville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.349 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.371 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10704 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 8269A |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1201 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10704 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8269a