NY S08275 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends the forfeiture of unemployment benefits during the COVID-19 state of emergency.
Title
Suspends the forfeiture of unemployment benefits during the COVID-19 state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.97 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.35 |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | substituted for a10348a |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.654 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8275A |
2020-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A10348 (Same As) 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.97