NY S08285 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Volunteer and Exempt Fireman's Benevolent Association of Nassau county.
Title
Relates to the Volunteer and Exempt Fireman's Benevolent Association of Nassau county.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.196 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.123 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a10383 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.737 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10383 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.196