NY S08317 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to rental vehicle protections.
Title
Extends provisions relating to rental vehicle protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.108 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.212 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a11097 |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1085 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A11097 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8317