NY S08328 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York City transit authority to operate its facilities and level of service on a daily twenty-four hour basis unless a declared state of emergency is in effect, requires the New York City transit authority or the metropolitan transportation authority to require that the levels of service furnished upon the rapid transit facilities maintained in the city of New York provide continuous service for twenty-four hours a day when a declared state of emergency is not in effect, and requires the Metropolitan transportation authority to require that the New York City transit authority railroad facilities and levels of service to be operated and maintained on a daily twenty-four hour basis unless a declared state of emergency is in effect.
Title
Requires the New York City transit authority to operate its facilities and level of service on a daily twenty-four hour basis unless a declared state of emergency is in effect, requires the New York City transit authority or the metropolitan transportation authority to require that the levels of service furnished upon the rapid transit facilities maintained in the city of New York provide continuous service for twenty-four hours a day when a declared state of emergency is not in effect, and requires the Metropolitan transportation authority to require that the New York City transit authority railroad facilities and levels of service to be operated and maintained on a daily twenty-four hour basis unless a declared state of emergency is in effect.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.900 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10445 (Same As) 2020-05-18 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions