NY S08334 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.335
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.335
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires prevailing wage to be paid for work performed on a public works project for any work involving the delivery to and hauling of aggregate supply construction materials, as well as any return hauls, whether empty or loaded and any time spent loading/unloading.
Title
Requires prevailing wage to be paid for work performed on a public works project for any work involving the delivery to and hauling of aggregate supply construction materials, as well as any return hauls, whether empty or loaded and any time spent loading/unloading.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.335 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a10626a |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1020 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8334A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A10626 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.335