NY S08353 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10459A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes reimbursement mechanisms for access to hospice services for residents of assisted living programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes reimbursement mechanisms for access to hospice services for residents of assisted living programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A10459A
2018-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1962
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 8353A
2018-06-01SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2018-05-02SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A10459 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback