NY S08370 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-08-10 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing voters an opportunity to cure deficiencies regarding absentee ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing voters an opportunity to cure deficiencies regarding absentee ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-10SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-07-23Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-07-23Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-23Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.347
2020-07-23Assemblysubstituted for a10830
2020-07-22Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-07-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.904
2020-07-21SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-07-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 8370B
2020-07-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2020-07-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 8370A
2020-07-16SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2020-05-19SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10830 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - substituted by s8370b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08370
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08370A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08370B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8370#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8370#SC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8370#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback