NY S08380 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - SIGNED CHAP.564
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - SIGNED CHAP.564
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the wage theft prevention act providing for certain notifications to employees in their primary languages and protections for employees.
Title
Establishes the wage theft prevention act providing for certain notifications to employees in their primary languages and protections for employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 42 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-10 | SIGNED CHAP.564 | |
2010-12-01 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-11-30 | returned to senate | |
2010-11-30 | passed assembly | |
2010-11-30 | ordered to third reading rules cal.582 | |
2010-11-30 | substituted for a11726 | |
2010-07-01 | referred to labor | |
2010-06-30 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-29 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1320 | |
2010-06-27 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11726 (Same As) 2010-11-30 - substituted by s8380