NY S08380 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.372
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes paid family leave for bereavement beginning in 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes paid family leave for bereavement beginning in 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.372
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.283
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10639a
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1963
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 8380A
2018-06-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2018-05-04SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A10639 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8380a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback