NY S08385 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.504
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands and to dedicate other lands as parklands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands and to dedicate other lands as parklands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.504
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.360
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10508a
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1733
2018-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 8385A
2018-06-06SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-05-04SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10508 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8385a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback