NY S08389 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands protections afforded to renters of motor vehicles and makes certain provisions relating to rental vehicle protections permanent.
Title
Expands protections afforded to renters of motor vehicles and makes certain provisions relating to rental vehicle protections permanent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.109 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.154 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a5270c |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1774 |
2018-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8389B |
2018-06-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8389A |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05270 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s8389b