NY S08414 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the New York Academy of Medicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the New York Academy of Medicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.447
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.65
2018-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a10656
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1254
2018-05-07SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10656 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s8414

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback