NY S08415 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the crime of loitering.
Title
Relates to the crime of loitering.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.98 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.41 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted for a10446a |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.666 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10446 (Same As) 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.98