NY S08418 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing additional bonds of the New York city transitional finance authority related to the epidemic resulting from spread of the disease known as COVID-19.
Title
Relates to authorizing additional bonds of the New York city transitional finance authority related to the epidemic resulting from spread of the disease known as COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.669 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10520 (Same As) 2020-05-27 - ordered to third reading rules cal.53