NY S08431 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing the Broome county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Broome.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing the Broome county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Broome.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.505
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.366
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10587
2018-06-14Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-31Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1474
2018-05-07SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A10587 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8431

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback