NY S08441 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to insurance coverage up to fifty thousand dollars for women ages 21 to 44 for in vitro fertilization and other fertility preservation treatments.
Title
Relates to insurance coverage up to fifty thousand dollars for women ages 21 to 44 for in vitro fertilization and other fertility preservation treatments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2061 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8441B |
2018-06-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8441A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |