NY S08483 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Patchogue, town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands, for the purpose of leasing such parklands to Wireless Towers LLC.
Title
Authorizes the village of Patchogue, town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands, for the purpose of leasing such parklands to Wireless Towers LLC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.198 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.142 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a10377a |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.756 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10377 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.198