NY S08492 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - signed chap.93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - signed chap.93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting a non-emergency incident involving a member of a protected class.
Title
Relates to reporting a non-emergency incident involving a member of a protected class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Senate | signed chap.93 |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.748 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8492 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-08 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-08 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.61 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | rules report cal.61 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-08 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-05 | Senate | print number 1531b |
2020-06-05 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-07-08 | Senate | print number 1531a |
2019-07-08 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1531B |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.748 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2020-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01531 (Same As) 2020-06-12 - signed chap.93