NY S08522 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10648
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10648
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the three-year exemption of mandatory continuing education for newly licensed certified public accountants and public accountants.
Title
Removes the three-year exemption of mandatory continuing education for newly licensed certified public accountants and public accountants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10648 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1426 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8522A |
2018-05-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10648 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.413