NY S08536 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.506
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the village of Clayton, county of Jefferson to transfer and convey certain parklands to Dean Hyde in exchange for certain lands owned by Dean Hyde which shall be used as parkland and as part of the village of Clayton's riverwalk project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the village of Clayton, county of Jefferson to transfer and convey certain parklands to Dean Hyde in exchange for certain lands owned by Dean Hyde which shall be used as parkland and as part of the village of Clayton's riverwalk project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.506
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.435
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11183
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1610
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-05SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-09SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A11183 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8536

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback