NY S08540 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system as the "Putnam County Workers Memorial Bridge".
Title
Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system as the "Putnam County Workers Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.202 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.916 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8540 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.70 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.70 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-06 | Senate | print number 7888b |
2020-06-06 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-05-15 | Senate | reference changed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-03-10 | Senate | print number 7888a |
2020-03-10 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-05-28 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7888B |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.916 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07888 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.202