NY S08541 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.154
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.154
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including Casse Lake, Gilead Lake, and Kirk Lake in the town of Carmel as inland waterways for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Relates to including Casse Lake, Gilead Lake, and Kirk Lake in the town of Carmel as inland waterways for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.154 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.917 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8541 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.113 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.113 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-05-04 | Senate | print number 10061a |
2020-05-04 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-03-06 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10061A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.917 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10061 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.154