NY S08560 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the production and sale of mead and braggot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the production and sale of mead and braggot.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.24
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.522
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.465
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11113
2018-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1802
2018-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 8560A
2018-06-06SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-05-10SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A11113 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8560a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback