NY S08561 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a New York food supply working group to provide advice, guidance, and recommendations on New York's food supply and related supply chain logistics in the wake of COVID-19.
Title
Establishes a New York food supply working group to provide advice, guidance, and recommendations on New York's food supply and related supply chain logistics in the wake of COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | approval memo.26 |
2020-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.316 |
2020-11-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.923 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8561A |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.211 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.211 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Senate | print number 10607a |
2020-07-10 | Senate | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2020-06-05 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10607A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.923 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8561A |
2020-07-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10607 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - approval memo.26