NY S08587 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.865
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares agreements exempting employers from liability for negligence related to the COVID-19 pandemic void and unenforceable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declares agreements exempting employers from liability for negligence related to the COVID-19 pandemic void and unenforceable.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.865
2020-07-20SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-07-20SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-07-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY
2020-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10838 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback