NY S08596 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-11 - PRINT NUMBER 8596B
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-11 - PRINT NUMBER 8596B
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for police officers in a city with a population of one million or more; provides that any person appointed as a paid member of the police force of such city shall become a resident of any political subdivision or municipal corporation within such city within one year of his or her appointment and shall continue to reside within any political subdivision or municipal corporation.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for police officers in a city with a population of one million or more; provides that any person appointed as a paid member of the police force of such city shall become a resident of any political subdivision or municipal corporation within such city within one year of his or her appointment and shall continue to reside within any political subdivision or municipal corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8596B |
2020-08-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8596A |
2020-07-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10910 (Same As) 2020-08-17 - referred to governmental operations