NY S08633 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that 85% of proceeds from the sale of any property that was previously used, operated or maintained by the office for people with developmental disabilities shall be used exclusively for state-operated residential services or state-operated community-based services provided by such office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that 85% of proceeds from the sale of any property that was previously used, operated or maintained by the office for people with developmental disabilities shall be used exclusively for state-operated residential services or state-operated community-based services provided by such office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.374
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.490
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10951
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1883
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-31SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-05-10SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

Same As/Similar To

A10951 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8633

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback