NY S08653 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fees and expenses in unemployment insurance proceedings; extends effectiveness.
Title
Relates to fees and expenses in unemployment insurance proceedings; extends effectiveness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A11026 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1884 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A11026 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.257