NY S08657 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Yaphank Presbyterian Church to file an application for exemption for real property taxation.
Title
Authorizes Yaphank Presbyterian Church to file an application for exemption for real property taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.184 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.370 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10680 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2018-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1616 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10680 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8657