NY S08663 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Adirondack road salt reduction task force, pilot plan and test program.
Title
Establishes the Adirondack road salt reduction task force, pilot plan and test program.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | approval memo.25 |
2020-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.313 |
2020-11-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.942 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8663A |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.184 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.184 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Senate | print number 8767a |
2020-07-10 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-11-25 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8767A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.942 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-07-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8663A |
2020-07-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
S06824 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A08767 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - approval memo.25
A08767 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - approval memo.25