NY S08668 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8668B
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8668B
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a civil action for deprivation of rights which is caused by any person or public entity.
Title
Provides a civil action for deprivation of rights which is caused by any person or public entity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8668B |
2020-08-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8668A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10978 (Same As) 2020-09-09 - referred to governmental operations