NY S08693 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and directs the commissioner of environmental conservation to conduct a study on food waste initiatives and to provide recommendations based on the study's findings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and directs the commissioner of environmental conservation to conduct a study on food waste initiatives and to provide recommendations based on the study's findings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.325
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.266
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a11171
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1619
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-10SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A11171 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8693

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback