NY S08702 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Community Mainstreaming Associates, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes Community Mainstreaming Associates, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.155 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.946 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8702 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.137 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | rules report cal.137 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-10 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-03-06 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10077 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.946 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10077 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.155