NY S08707 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to detaining persons for longer than twenty-four hours.
Title
Relates to detaining persons for longer than twenty-four hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.868 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8707A |
2020-07-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2020-07-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10884 (Same As) 2020-08-17 - print number 10884a