NY S08724 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the public service commission to study and report on time-of-use plans offered by electric and gas utilities.
Title
Directs the public service commission to study and report on time-of-use plans offered by electric and gas utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.55 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.951 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8724 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.182 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.182 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-09 | Senate | print number 8517a |
2020-07-09 | Senate | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-08-07 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8517A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.951 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-07-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08517 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - tabled