NY S08730 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.375
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms a transportation contract of the Fulton city school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms a transportation contract of the Fulton city school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.375
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.374
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10752
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1620
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-10SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A10752 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8730

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback