NY S08734 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - signed chap.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - signed chap.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of certificate of residence forms to individuals desiring to enroll in community colleges as non-resident students.
Title
Relates to the issuance of certificate of residence forms to individuals desiring to enroll in community colleges as non-resident students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | signed chap.296 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1001 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8734 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.282 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | rules report cal.282 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10793 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1001 |
2020-07-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10793 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - signed chap.296