NY S08739 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that receipt of the temporary emergency increase in unemployment compensation benefits as provided for by the federal Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (15 U.S.C. Sec. 9023) shall not affect benefit eligibility for certain public assistance benefits.
Title
Provides that receipt of the temporary emergency increase in unemployment compensation benefits as provided for by the federal Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (15 U.S.C. Sec. 9023) shall not affect benefit eligibility for certain public assistance benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1002 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10743 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.279