NY S08750 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation to include species designated by the Secretary of the Interior as endangered or threatened to the endangered and threatened species list.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation to include species designated by the Secretary of the Interior as endangered or threatened to the endangered and threatened species list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.170 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.957 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8750 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.225 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | rules report cal.225 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-04 | Senate | print number 4077a |
2020-05-04 | Senate | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4077A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.957 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-07-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04077 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.170