NY S08755 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Firefighter Tim Gunther Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Firefighter Tim Gunther Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.256 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1024 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8755 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.243 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | rules report cal.243 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Senate | print number 8361a |
2020-07-10 | Senate | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-15 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8361A |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1024 |
2020-07-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08361 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.256