NY S08761 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to modifying delinquent mortgage loans and single point of contact.
Title
Relates to modifying delinquent mortgage loans and single point of contact.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.305 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a7513a |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.959 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO BANKS |
2020-07-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07513 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.305