NY S08764 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.376
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms a transportation contract of the Port Washington Union Free School District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms a transportation contract of the Port Washington Union Free School District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.376
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.377
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10824a
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1678
2018-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 8764A
2018-06-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-05-14SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10824 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8764a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback