NY S08786 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the New York state council on mental health emergency and crisis response.
Title
Relates to establishing the New York state council on mental health emergency and crisis response.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.965 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8786A |
2020-07-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-07-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2020-07-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |