NY S08791 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.450
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Albany to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city of Albany to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.450
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.254
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10790a
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to cities
2018-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-07SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1653
2018-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 8791A
2018-05-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-05-18SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10790 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8791a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback