NY S08796 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain party designations and nominations to be made via video teleconference upon notice to the members of the respective committee; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Allows certain party designations and nominations to be made via video teleconference upon notice to the members of the respective committee; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.6 |
2020-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.142 |
2020-08-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.341 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a10733a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.968 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8796A |
2020-07-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10733 (Same As) 2020-08-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.6