NY S08798 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.509
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Chabad of Great Neck to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land in the village of Great Neck, county of Nassau.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Chabad of Great Neck to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land in the village of Great Neck, county of Nassau.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.509
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.393
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11059a
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-18AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenateREPASSED SENATE
2018-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 8798A
2018-06-13SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-13Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-13AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1681
2018-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-18SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A11059 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8798a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08798&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08798&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08798
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08798&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08798A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8798#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8798#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8798#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08798&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback