NY S08802 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming certain transportation contracts of the Corning city school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming certain transportation contracts of the Corning city school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.377
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.458
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10771
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1971
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-05-18SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10771 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8802

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback